MA S1625 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2191
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to establishing a disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Rep. Christopher Fallon [D] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Stanley Rosenberg [D] | Rep. Martin Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2191 |
2013-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2191 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1625 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1625.pdf |