MA S1637 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5080
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to ensure marketplace fairness in taxation. Revenue.
Title
Ensuring marketplace fairness in taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-02 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5080 |
2019-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1726 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H2393 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2396 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2393 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2394 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2396 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S1763 (Similar To) 2020-05-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1761 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4467
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2622 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2624 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2629 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1623 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2225 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4468
S2243 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
H3995 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4476
H4081 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
H5080 (Replaced by) 2020-11-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1637 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1637.pdf |