MA S1649 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2756
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to facilitate disposition of surplus property for the development of affordable and workforce housing. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To facilitate disposition of surplus property for the development of affordable and workforce housing
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D] | Rep. Kevin Honan [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Sanchez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Accompanied by H2756 |
2015-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2756 (Replaces) 2016-04-19 - Accompanied S1649
S1698 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1724 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1617 (Similar To) 2016-10-27 - New draft substituted, see S2503
H2887 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2967 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S725 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1698 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1724 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1617 (Similar To) 2016-10-27 - New draft substituted, see S2503
H2887 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H2967 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S725 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1557 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1649 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1649.pdf |