MA S1652 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2533 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1652 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1652.pdf |