MA S1666 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2113
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2113
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to comprehensive siting reform for land based wind projects. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to comprehensive siting reform for land based wind projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2113 |
2011-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2011 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Barnstable High School, Knight Auditorium |
2011-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2011 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Tilden Arts Center, Cape Cod Community College |
2011-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in JJ's Lodge, Jiminy Peak Mountain Resort |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2113 (Replaced by) 2012-01-30 - Discharged to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1666 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13574&generalCourtId=1 |