MA S1670 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Massachusetts National Guard Service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts National Guard Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2874 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3699 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H3647 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3645 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2857 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2600 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5323
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S2428 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2874 (Replaced by) 2022-05-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3647 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H3064 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3645 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2857 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2600 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5323
S2396 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S2428 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2874 (Replaced by) 2022-05-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1670 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1670.pdf |