MA S1671 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2447
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to promoting safety by making gas gate boxes easily accessible to gas company service employees and emergency public service personnel. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to promoting safety by making gas gate boxes easily accessible to gas company service employees and emergency public service personnel.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2447 |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2447 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1671 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11709&generalCourtId=1 |