MA S1676 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2240
Note: Legislation replaced by S2576
Note: Legislation replaced by S2576
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - New draft substituted, see S2576
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for the abandonment of a certain water line easement in Revere and Malden. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing for the abandonment of a certain water line easement in Revere and Malden
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2576 |
2018-06-25 | Senate | New draft amended, see S2576 |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Read second |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2576 |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2240 |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2017 from 02:00 PM-03:00 PM in 222 |
2017-07-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H3384 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3811 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3995
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3964 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2017
H4076 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
S2240 (Replaced by) 2018-06-25 - New text substituted, see S2576
S2576 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2018
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
H3811 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3995
H3874 (Similar To) 2017-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2017
H3876 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2017
H1912 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3964 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 159 of the Acts of 2017
H4076 (Similar To) 2017-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 167 of the Acts of 2017
S2240 (Replaced by) 2018-06-25 - New text substituted, see S2576
S2576 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2018
H4972 (Similar To) 2018-12-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4993
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1676.pdf |