MA S1678 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1876
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Gold Star Family vanity registration plates. Transportation.
Title
Relative to Gold Star Family vanity registration plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Robert Fennell [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1876 |
2013-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1876 (Replaced by) 2013-10-10 - New draft substituted, see S1878
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1678 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1678.pdf |