MA S1683 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the prohibition of the use of state funds. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
An Act relative to the prohibition of the use of state funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1500 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S385 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1782 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2875 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
S1500 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S385 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1782 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2875 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1683.pdf |