MA S1691 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Pending: Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets
Pending: Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further expand Bristol Community College in downtown New Bedford. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To further expand Bristol Community College in downtown New Bedford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S163 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S387 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1303 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1777 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1536 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S387 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S1303 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1777 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1536 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1691 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1691.pdf |