MA S1732 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2386
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to state spending control. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to state spending control
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2386 |
2015-05-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1587 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1600 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1529 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1545 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1177 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied S1188
S1527 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S154 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1610 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1551 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1926 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2016
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1587 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1600 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1529 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1542 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1545 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1177 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied S1188
S1527 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S154 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1610 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1551 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1926 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2016
H734 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1732 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1732.pdf |