MA S174 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4421
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the appointment of the secretary of Housing and Economic Development. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to the appointment of the secretary of Housing and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4421 |
2011-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in 222 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4421 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S174 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12843&generalCourtId=1 |