MA S1747 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1876
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1876
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the certification of veterans service officers and agents. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to the certification of veterans service officers and agents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1876 |
2013-05-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1876 (Replaced by) 2013-10-10 - New draft substituted, see S1878
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1747 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1747.pdf |