MA S1754 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the failure to remove existing poles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to the failure to remove existing poles
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Mark Cusack [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. John Keenan [D] | Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2366 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2366 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1654 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1120 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
H2977 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
H2921 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2952 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2956 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
S1654 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1120 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
H2977 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4321
H2921 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2952 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
H2956 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1754 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1754.pdf |