MA S1787 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S601
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-02 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-02 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities, and families that include persons with disabilities; reports, the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 1787).
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to the need for accessible homes for the elderly, returning veterans with disabilities and families that include persons with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-10-02 | House | Read second |
2013-09-30 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
2013-06-06 | Senate | New draft of S601 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S601 (Replaces) 2013-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, S1787
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1787 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1787.pdf |