MA S1791 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-12 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
For legislation to clarify warehousing
Title
Clarify warehousing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-08-12 | Rules suspended | |
2010-08-12 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting | |
2010-07-27 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-07-26 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-26 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-26 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-04-13 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2009-01-20 | Public Hearing date 10/15 at 1:00 PM in Hearing Room A1 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/s01791.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/senate/186/st01/st01791.htm |