MA S180 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to out of state price authorization for chapter 766 students. Education.
Title
Relative to out of state price authorization for chapter 766 students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-05-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S180 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9510&generalCourtId=1 |