MA S1800 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow cities and towns to increase the local tax rate on meals. Revenue.
Title
To allow cities and towns to increase the local tax rate on meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S767 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2492
S261 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied S243
S98 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H603 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Accompanied H558
H2838 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
S261 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Accompanied S243
S98 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H603 (Similar To) 2024-02-20 - Accompanied H558
H2838 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1800 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1800.pdf |