MA S1805 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S19
Note: Replaces legislation S1806
Note: Replaces legislation S1806
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S1806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Reprinted as amended, see S1806
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act to foster economic independence. The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the Senate Bill encouraging low-income savings and economic opportunity (Senate, No. 19); reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft entitled “An Act to foster economic independence” (Senate, No. 1805).
Title
To foster economic independence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S1806 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #91 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 1] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Read third |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, as a new draft for S19 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #85 (Brewer) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #12 (Hedlund) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #76 (Jehlen) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #69 (Jehlen) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #64 (Creem) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #60 (Spilka) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #58 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #57 (Spilka) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #54 (Eldridge) rejected - Roll Call #90 [YEAS 10 - NAYS 28] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #44 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #41 (Ross) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #40 (Barrett) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #27 (Donoghue) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Hedlund) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #11 (Donnelly) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #86 (Lovely) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #83 (Jehlen) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #82 (Chang-Diaz) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #81 (Finegold) adopted - Roll Call #89 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #80 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Pending amendment #78 (Keenan) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Further amendment #78.1 (Forry) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #78 (Keenan) pending |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #75 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #74 (Jehlen) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #73 (Jehlen) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #72 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #70 (Keenan) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #68 (Jehlen) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #67 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #66 (Knapik) rejected - Roll Call #88 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 32] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #65 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #63 (Eldridge) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #62 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #56 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #53 (Wolf) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #51 (Knapik) rejected - Roll Call #87 [YEAS 5 - NAYS 33] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #50 (Donoghue) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #48 (Timilty) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #47 (Eldridge) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #43 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #42 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #39 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #37 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Keenan) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #35 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Keenan) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Spilka) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Spilka) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #30 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #29 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Wolf) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #86 [YEAS 7 - NAYS 31] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Ross) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Barrett) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #23 (Rush) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #21 (Ross) adopted - Roll Call #85 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #20 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #84 [YEAS 8 - NAYS 29] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #19 (Rush) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #17 (Michael Moore) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Joint | Amendment #14 (Barrett) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Barrett) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #83 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Donnelly) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Downing) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Tarr) rejected |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Tarr) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #2 (O'Connor Ives) adopted |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S19 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S19 (Replaces) 2013-06-24 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S1805
S1806 (Replaces) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
S1806 (Replaces) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1805 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1805.pdf |