MA S1806 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts Port Authority Community Advisory Committee. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Port Authority Community Advisory Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2364 |
2016-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2364 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1448 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S358 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S294 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
H1390 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1448 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1359 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S358 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
S799 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S294 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2344
H1390 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1806 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1806.pdf |