MA S1807 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1849
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-12 - Accompanied S1849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-12 - Accompanied S1849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Adams to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Adams to grant an additional license for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Senate | Accompanied S1849 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1849 |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-07-01 | House | House concurred |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1849 (Replaced by) 2013-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S1867
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1807 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1807.pdf |