MA S182 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation for a study by the Executive Office of Housing and Economic Development relative to a state new markets tax credit program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Providing for a study by the Executive Office of Housing and Economic Development relative to a state new markets tax credit program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2013 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in Western New England University |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S182 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S182.pdf |