MA S1850 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to commuter transit benefits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to commuter transit benefits
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2696 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2900 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2705 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2808 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2900 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2705 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H2808 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1850 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1850.pdf |