MA S1851 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Fall River to use certain park land for combined sewer overflow control. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Fall River to use certain park land for combined sewer overflow control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 41 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Laid before the Govenor |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Enacted - see Roll Call# 253 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0] |
2014-02-26 | House | Enacted 148 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 294) |
2014-02-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-08-19 | House | House concurred |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1851 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1851.pdf |