MA S1856 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-27 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to increasing access to homeowners insurance
Title
Relative to increasing access to homeowners insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Wolf [D] | Rep. Demetruis Atsalis [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-06-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, June 21, 2012 |
2011-09-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1856 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14254&generalCourtId=1 |