MA S1856 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act providing for sewer commissioners in the town of Wareham By Mr. Pacheco, a petition of Marc R. Pacheco and Susan Williams Gifford to provide for sewer commissioners in the town of Wareham. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for sewer commissioners in the town of Wareham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Enacted |
2014-04-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-03-24 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2013-09-09 | House | House concurred |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1856 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1856.pdf |