MA S1867 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Adams to convert a seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises to an annual license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Adams to convert a seasonal license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises to an annual license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 114 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-10-16 | House | Enacted |
2013-10-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-09-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Substituted for S1849 |
2013-09-19 | Senate | New draft (Downing) of S1849 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1867 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1867.pdf |