MA S1867 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit misleading telemarketer calls to consumers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To prohibit misleading telemarketer calls to consumers
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] | Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S385 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S1736 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1689 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H1195 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1736 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1689 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4589
H1195 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1867 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1867.pdf |