MA S1869 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect our environment and reduce the carbon footprint of the commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To protect our environment and lower our carbon footprint
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S475 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1870 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2108 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2181
H446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2113 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S475 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1870 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H2108 (Similar To) 2017-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2181
H446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2113 (Similar To) 2017-11-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4041
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1869 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1869.pdf |