MA S1872 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the penalty for distracted driving. Transportation.
Title
Increasing the penalty for distracted driving
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D] |
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] | Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2387 |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S156 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S837 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S838 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1092 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2229
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H3040 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S850 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1449 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S156 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S837 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S838 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1092 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2229
S1240 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1219 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H3040 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
S850 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H1449 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1872 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1872.pdf |