MA S1873 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2656
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a Lifelong Learning and Training Account program. Revenue.
Title
To establish a lifelong learning and training program
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2656 |
2023-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1849 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4725
S1828 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S310 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2588
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2656 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2277 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2852
S1828 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S310 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2588
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2656 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2277 (Similar To) 2024-07-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2852
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1873 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1873.pdf |