MA S1875 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to facilitate the completion of the New Bedford/Fall River commuter rail extension project. Transportation.
Title
Facilitating the completion of the New Bedford/Fall River commuter rail extension project
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | House concurred |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1681 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S93 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S92 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S320 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
S93 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S92 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S320 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2316
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1875.pdf |