MA S1880 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave for Timothy J. Stott, an employee of the Department of Corrections. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave for Timothy J. Stott, an employee of the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-03-14 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1880 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15033&generalCourtId=1 |