MA S1881 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Hartmut R. Andrade, an employee of the Bristol County Sheriff’s office. Senate Ways and Means .
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Hartmut R. Andrade, an employee of the Bristol County Sheriff’s office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2011-05-12 | House | Enacted |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-05-12 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2011-05-11 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-04-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2011-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-04-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2011-04-21 | House | Referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2011-04-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2011-04-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-04-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2011-03-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-03-14 | House | House concurred |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Service |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Joint Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1881 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=15050&generalCourtId=1 |