MA S1881 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote accountability in tax expenditures. Revenue.
Title
Promoting accountability in tax expenditures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1810 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2096 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
S812 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4248
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2113 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S2484 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H4008 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 68 of the Acts of 2021
S788 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5352
S1931 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2956
S361 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2096 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S1179 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4681
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1881 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1881.pdf |