MA S1889 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Tarr, a petition of Bruce E. Tarr and Donald F. Humason, Jr. for legislaton to promote road safety. Transportation.
Title
Promoting road safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/10/2016 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S340 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied S297
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1013 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1533 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1959
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1813 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1031 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1123 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1221 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1893 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1013 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S1533 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1959
S1859 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1818 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
H627 (Similar To) 2016-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4574
S1881 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1879 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S1191 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see S2449
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1796 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1813 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S333 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2348
S1786 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1682 (Similar To) 2016-07-26 - New draft substituted, see S2463
S1031 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1123 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1221 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1889 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1889.pdf |