MA S1900 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to high speed chases. Transportation.
Title
Relative to high speed chases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2387 |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2387 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1722 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S764 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1116 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
S907 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S679 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
S697 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S664 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1263 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S1722 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S764 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S440 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2241
S990 (Similar To) 2015-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1116 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2279
S907 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S679 (Similar To) 2016-07-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2465
S697 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S664 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1262 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1263 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1900 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1900.pdf |