MA S1909 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1788
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the board of assessors of the town of Newbury to grant an abatement of real estate taxes to certain Plum Island homeowners for fiscal year 2013 Senate, Thursday, October 31, 2013 - New draft (Senator Tarr) to the Senate Bill authorizing the board of assessors of the town of Newbury to grant an abatement of real estate taxes to certain Plum Island home owners for fiscal year 2013 (Senate, No. 1788).
Title
Authorizing the board of assessors of the town of Newbury to grant an abatement of real estate taxes to certain Plum Island homeowners for fiscal year 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-01-23 | House | Enacted |
2014-01-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-19 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-19 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-31 | Senate | Substituted for S1788 |
2013-10-31 | Senate | New draft of S1788 |
Same As/Similar To
S1788 (Replaces) 2013-10-31 - Amended (Tarr) substituting a new draft S1909
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1909 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1909.pdf |