MA S192 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2281
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2281
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the Home Works Program. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Creating the Home Works Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2281 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Springfield Technical Community College |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S1880 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1660 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2281 (Replaced by) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1636 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1660 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S2281 (Replaced by) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S192 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S192.pdf |