MA S1920 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the authorization of the city of Westfield Retirement Board to grant a superannuation retirement benefit. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the authorization of the retirement board of the city of Westfield to grant a superannuation retirement benefit to Lynda Cavanaugh
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 81 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-09-03 | House | Enacted |
2015-08-31 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-08-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-08-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-08-10 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-05-04 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1396 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1402 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1396 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1399 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1398 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1277 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1920 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1920.pdf |