MA S1921 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to group health insurance for eligible retirees in the town of Carver. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Regarding group health insurance for eligible employees and retirees in the town of Carver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 178 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-23 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-23 | House | Enacted |
2016-07-21 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-05 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-05 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-05-11 | House | House concurred |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1926 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2016
S2460 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2016
S1348 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1350 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S604 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S634 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S562 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1395 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1299 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1926 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2016
S2460 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 284 of the Acts of 2016
S1348 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1350 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S532 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S604 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S634 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S562 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S479 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1395 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1299 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1921 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1921.pdf |