MA S1921 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the taxation of cider. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the taxation of cider
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4009 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1928 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H4009 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1928 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1921 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1921.pdf |