MA S1926 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect homeowners from unfair tax lien practices by cities and towns. Revenue.
Title
Protecting homeowners from unfair tax lien practices by cities and towns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2743 |
2021-07-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3640 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H355 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2206 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5137
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1803 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S864 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H2170 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
H355 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S273 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2206 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5137
S151 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2709
S1803 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S864 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
S889 (Similar To) 2022-07-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S3069
S2743 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H431 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H432 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1926 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1926.pdf |