MA S1933 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise. Revenue.
Title
To clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1933 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1933.pdf |