MA S194 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the advertising of prices for motor vehicles. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle price advertising
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2172 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H460 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S189 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2162 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2357 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2205 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S795 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2172 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2321 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S657 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2698
S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3291 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
H460 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S194 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S194.pdf |