MA S1940 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1941
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Accompanied S1941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-23 - Accompanied S1941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further amend Chapter 654 of the Acts of 1975 (2). Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Further amending Chapter 654 of the Acts of 1975 (2)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Senate | Accompanied S1941 |
2014-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2014 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-12-23 | House | House concurred |
2013-11-25 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1941 (Replaced by) 2014-05-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 118 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1940 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1940.pdf |