MA S1941 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize resiliency measures under commercial property assessed clean energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Authorizing resiliency measures under commercial property assessed clean energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2005 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2802 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S523 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2894 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2639 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2802 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S523 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2894 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1977 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2639 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1941.pdf |