MA S1947 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to consumer protection and private utility lines and poles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to consumer protection and private utility lines and poles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2552 |
2019-10-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
S123 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H957 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1975 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S120 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H54 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1628 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3695
S1985 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
S123 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2807 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H957 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2820 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1975 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3966 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2552 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1947 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1947.pdf |