MA S1957 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4727
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a vendors’ collection allowance. Revenue.
Title
To establish a vendors’ collection allowance
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4727 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S330 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2590
S25 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2770
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S25 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2770
S2770 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4727 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1957 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1957.pdf |